Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Expansion
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Tarlau, McIntosh, Walker, Kaiser, Queen, Morhaim, Pendergrass, Luedtke, Hill, Turner, Lierman, Hornberger, Platt, Waldstreicher, Sophocleus, Clippinger, M. Washington, Reznik, Lafferty, Fennell, Chang, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow specified individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; expanding eligibility of the credit to allow specified individuals without specified qualifying children to claim the credit; allowing specified individuals to claim the credit without regard to a specified age limitation; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0014
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1047 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/01/2016
Legislative Date
8/01/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/01/2016 8/01/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Expansion
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM