Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Prescribers and Dispensers - Required Query
Sponsored by
Delegate Schulz
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified regulations for the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to require a prescriber and a dispenser to query the Program before prescribing or dispensing a monitored prescription drug to a patient; requiring, except under specified circumstances, a prescriber and a dispenser to query the Program for a specified purpose before prescribing or dispensing a monitored prescription drug to a patient; making a prescriber or dispenser who violates the Act subject to disciplinary action; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
9/04/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 9/04/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-01, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-04.1, 21-2A-08, 21-2A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM