Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that licenses to manufacture, sell, buy, and store cigarettes do not authorize the licensee to manufacture, ship, import, or sell into or within the State a cigarette that has a characterizing flavor; providing that a public statement that cigarettes or other tobacco products have or produce a certain smell or taste is presumptive evidence that they have a characterizing flavor if the statement is made by certain persons: prohibiting the sale of electronic smoking devices by mail or certain other networks; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0233
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/04/2019
Legislative Date
9/04/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983594/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {993496/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/04/2019 9/04/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {983594/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {993496/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   16.5-101, 16.5-205, 16.5-212, 16.5-214.1, 16.5-217, 16.7-101, 16.7-204, 16.7-204.1, 16.7-211, 16.7-215, 16-101, 16-206, 16-209, 16-214, 16-223, 16-3A-02, 16-3A-03, 16-501 )
(   10-107 )
(   24-305, 24-307 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:30 PM
Click to return on the top page