Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to rename the Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge as the Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/13/2017
Legislative Date
11/13/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {140617/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {453622/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (37-88)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-35)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/13/2017 11/13/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highways - Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge - Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {140617/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Floor Amendment {453622/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (37-88) 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas “Mac” Middleton Bridge
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (102-35) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted (47-0) 53
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Text - Chapter - Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas “Mac” Middleton Bridge
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM