Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of 3 Years
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who is charged with the care of a child under the age of 3 years from allowing the child to be locked or confined in a dwelling, a building, an enclosure, or a motor vehicle out of the sight of the person charged unless the person charged with care provides a reliable person at least 15 years old to remain with the child to protect the child; provides a penalty not to exceed $500 or imprisonment not to exceed 30 days, or both, for violations of the Act; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0383 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/20/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/20/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/13/2015 1/13/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM