Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsored by
Delegate Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the time period within which a local department of social services is required to expunge specified reports and records of suspected child abuse and neglect; authorizing a local department to immediately expunge specified reports and records of suspected child abuse and neglect under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0012
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/18/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {182513/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458276/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Delegates Carter, Anderson, and Kittleman
Proceedings
72
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/18/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/13/2015 1/13/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {182513/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 32
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {458276/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 56
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Delegates Carter, Anderson, and Kittleman 72
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM