Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consolidated Senior Sport Fishing License - Minimum Age
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Lowering the age at which a resident may obtain a consolidated senior sport fishing license from 65 years to 62 years.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1693 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/08/2018
Legislative Date
11/08/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consolidated Senior Sport Fishing License - Minimum Age
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/08/2018 11/08/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Consolidated Senior Sport Fishing License - Minimum Age
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM