Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration – Sidewalks Within Priority Funding Areas – Repair and Maintenance
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to repair and maintain certain sidewalks that are located within an area designated as a priority funding area.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/17/2018
Legislative Date
10/17/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/17/2018 10/17/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highway Administration – Sidewalks Within Priority Funding Areas – Repair and Maintenance
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-629, 8-630, 8-631 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM