Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local Entities
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Environment)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified fee revenue collected for the Bay Restoration Fund to be used by specified local public entities to implement regulations for on-site sewage disposal systems that utilize the best available technology for the removal of nitrogen.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/29/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/29/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 31
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM