Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Background Check
Sponsored by
Delegates McKay and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law to require the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to require an individual to pass a polygraph examination or extensive background check, or both, rather than just a polygraph examination, before being appointed to serve as a correctional officer in a correctional facility; and making a conforming change.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0272
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/13/2018
Legislative Date
11/13/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2019
Legislative Date
1/10/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/13/2018 11/13/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Background Check
House 1/10/2019 1/10/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM