Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) Check
Sponsored by
Delegate Schulz
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified licensed firearms dealer or secondary seller to conditionally sell, rent, or transfer a firearm to a firearm applicant under specified circumstances; prohibiting a licensee or secondary seller from selling, renting, or transferring a firearm under specified circumstances; requiring a licensee or secondary seller to notify a firearms applicant that an application has been approved or disapproved; requiring the firearms applicant to return a firearm within 10 days of notice of disapproval; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0818 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
9/30/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 9/30/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-123, 5-124, 5-124.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM