Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Organization and Negotiation
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti, Cassilly, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that full-time deputy sheriffs at the rank of captain and below and full-time correctional officers at the rank of captain and below in the Office of the Sheriff of Harford County have the right to organize and negotiate with the Harford County Executive and Harford County Sheriff with regard to certain wages and employee health care premium share; requiring the right to organize and negotiate to be conducted in accordance with certain provisions of the Harford County Code unless otherwise provided in the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/04/2017
Legislative Date
8/04/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/04/2017 8/04/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Organization and Negotiation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM