Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for a partial expungement of certain criminal records under certain circumstances; requiring a court to order that certain records be removed from a certain website; providing that only a certain record is eligible for partial expungement; and repealing a provision of law establishing that if a person is not entitled to expungement of one charge or conviction in a certain unit the person is not entitled to expungement of any other charge or conviction in the unit.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0220 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2019
Legislative Date
1/10/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
House 1/10/2019 1/10/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM