Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Continuing Education - Comparative Law Course
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the number of clock hours of continuing education instruction a licensee must complete to qualify for renewal of a license to provide real estate brokerage services; requiring specified licensees to take a course that outlines real estate laws in neighboring states as a condition of license renewal on or after January 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/20/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/20/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM