Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegate Haynes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting recent high school graduates from payment of tuition to attend a community college in the State under specified circumstances; providing a 50% discount on tuition to individuals unemployed for at least 6 months but who have been seeking employment and who are attending a community college and seeking vocational certificates; requiring the State to reimburse community colleges for foregone tuition revenue; requiring that funds used to reimburse community colleges shall be paid from the Education Trust Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0696 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/20/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 8/20/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 3:30 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM