Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Surveys and Sexual Assault Victim Advocates
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish procedures for the administration of sexual assault surveys by institutions of higher education; requiring each institution of higher education to administer a sexual assault survey every 3 years to students, faculty members, and employees in accordance with specified procedures; requiring each institution of higher education to report school specific sexual assault survey results to the Commission; requiring the appointment of sexual assault victim advocates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
8/21/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 8/21/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM