Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solar Energy Grant Program - Minimum Grant Amounts
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain minimum grant amounts under the Solar Energy Grant Program for solar energy property installed at a certain homeowner's principal residence of at least $2,000 for photovoltaic property and at least $1,000 for solar water heating property with a collecting area of 10 to 100 square feet.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Solar Energy Grant Program - Minimum Grant Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Solar Energy Grant Program - Minimum Grant Amounts
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2001, 9-2007 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM