Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Reporting to CODIS
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain regulations to include a requirement that results from certain testing obtained from a sexual assault evidence collection kit be submitted to the Federal Bureau of Investigation's "Combined DNA Index System" within 6 months after the evidence has been tested.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2017
Legislative Date
10/25/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/25/2017 10/25/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Reporting to CODIS
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM