Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special Assessments
Sponsored by
Delegate Beidle
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a contract for the resale of a unit in a condominium by a unit owner other than a developer is not enforceable unless the contract contains a specified notice and the unit owner furnishes to the purchaser specified information concerning potential special assessments; and providing that a contract for the resale of a lot in a development subject to the authority of a homeowners association is not enforceable by the vendor unless the purchaser is given a specified notice concerning potential special assessments.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0176
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/01/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/01/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-135, 11B-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM