Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development – Rental Residential Buildings – Prohibition on Exclusive Access Agreements
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Declaring a certain State policy concerning rental residential buildings; prohibiting the owner of a rental residential building that receives financial assistance from the Department of Housing and Community Development from entering into or renewing an exclusive access agreement with an Internet provider or a television provider under certain circumstances; defining "rental residential building" and "television provider"; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/01/2018
Legislative Date
8/01/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/01/2018 8/01/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing and Community Development – Rental Residential Buildings – Prohibition on Exclusive Access Agreements
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 4-201, 4-216.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM