Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Sponsored by
Delegate George
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a municipality from requiring an individual to provide a reason that the individual will be unable to vote in person on election day in order to vote by absentee ballot.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/13/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM