Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Renewal Period for Retired Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a handgun permit issued to a retired law enforcement officer of the State or a county or municipal corporation of the State expires on the last day of the holder's birth month following 5 years after the date the permit is issued and may be renewed for successive periods of 5 years each if, at the time of an application for renewal, the applicant possesses the qualifications for the issuance of a permit.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0300 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
7/03/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 7/03/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-304, 5-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM