Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate McDermott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly creating, building, or installing a specified hidden compartment in a motor vehicle; prohibiting a person from knowingly owning or operating a motor vehicle that contains a specified hidden compartment; authorizing the seizure of specified motor vehicles involved in a violation of the Act; requiring the forfeiture of specified motor vehicles seized under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0443
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/15/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/15/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-419, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM