Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource Officers
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that at least one school resource officer be assigned to each public school in the State; requiring specified public schools to hire retired law enforcement officers as school resource officers for the school; requiring specified school resource officers to obtain a special police officer commission issued by the Department of State Police; requiring the county superintendent to submit an application to the Secretary of State Police for a special police commission for each school resource officer hired; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0020 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/06/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/16/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/06/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2015 1/16/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m.
House 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 26-102, 7-1701 through 7-1705, 7-437 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM