Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unappropriated General Fund Surplus - Appropriation to Pension Fund and Postretirement Health Benefits Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified required appropriation to require, beginning in fiscal year 2021, an appropriation of up to $25,000,000 to specified accumulation funds of the State Retirement and Pension System and an appropriation of up to $25,000,000 to the Postretirement Health Benefits Trust Fund; and altering the date by which the Department of Legislative Services is required to conduct a specified review and submit a report regarding required appropriations to the State Retirement and Pension System.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2016
Legislative Date
10/05/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-5)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2016 10/05/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Unappropriated General Fund Surplus - Appropriation to Pension Fund and Postretirement Health Benefits Trust Fund
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Unappropriated General Fund Surplus - Appropriation to Pension Fund and Postretirement Health Benefits Trust Fund
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (130-5) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 36
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Text - Chapter - Unappropriated General Fund Surplus - Appropriation to Pension Fund and Postretirement Health Benefits Trust Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM