Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Rate Adjustment or Fees to Recover Profits Lost During Service Disruption - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Vitale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Public Service Commission from authorizing an electric company to adjust the electric company's rates or impose any fee to recover profits lost during a disruption in electrical service.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0009 Session: 2012 2nd Special Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
7/11/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 7/11/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM