Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsored by
Delegate Schulz
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring individuals who apply to register to vote after June 30, 2015, to submit proof of United States citizenship; providing that individuals who are not citizens of the United States are not qualified to be registered voters; requiring an applicant for voter registration to submit specified documents or information to prove United States citizenship; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/13/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/13/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-103, 3-202, 3-501, 9-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM