Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County Public Charter School Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Schulz
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Frederick County Public Charter School Program; establishing the Frederick County Public Charter School Board; authorizing an applicant for a specified charter in Frederick County to apply under the Maryland Public Charter School Program or the Frederick County Public Charter School Program; granting the County Council of Frederick County public chartering authority for granting specified charters under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
7/24/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 7/24/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-202, 9-101, 9-102, 9-102.1, 9-103, 9-104, 9-105, 9-106, 9-107, 9-108, 9-109, 9-110, 9-111, 9-112, 9-202 through 9-206, 9-301 through 9-313 )
(   23-201, 23-204, 31-101, 31-102, 31-109, 31-111, 31-111.9 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM