Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Material Harmful to Minors - Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from offering for sale in a retail establishment open to the general public a book, magazine, or any other printed material, the cover or content of which is harmful to minors, if the material is on open display to, or within the convenient reach of, minors who may frequent the retail establishment, with a specified exception; providing a civil penalty of $100 for the first violation, and $300 for subsequent violations of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/27/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/27/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-203.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM