Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant charged with causing abuse or neglect of a vulnerable adult in the first or second degree; providing that a judge may authorize the pretrial release of the defendant on specified conditions; requiring the judge to order the continued detention of the defendant if neither suitable bail nor other conditions will reasonably ensure that the defendant will not flee or pose a danger to a specified person or the community before trial; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0412
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0382 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/20/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2015
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/20/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/13/2015 1/13/2015 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM