Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Fund - Hunger Relief Initiatives
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available for certain vehicles a special registration plate supporting hunger relief initiatives; authorizing certain persons to apply to the Administration for the special registration plate for certain classes of vehicles; requiring the owner of a vehicle assigned a special registration plate to pay certain fees; establishing the Hunger Relief Initiatives Fund; requiring that certain fees collected under the Act be used only for funding hunger relief initiatives; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/08/2019
Legislative Date
7/08/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/08/2019 7/08/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Fund - Hunger Relief Initiatives
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-619.4 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM