Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from specified retirement plans within a subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for retired individuals who are at least 65 years old or who are disabled or whose spouse is disabled; altering the determination of the maximum annual benefit under the Social Security Act for specified purposes; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0300 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
6/09/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 6/09/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page