Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Encouraging the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to approve provider applications for patients who have an opioid use disorder.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0893
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM