Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Commemorative Month - German-American Heritage Month
Sponsored by
Delegates Aumann, Kipke, McDonough, Oaks, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim October as German-American Heritage Month; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe the month with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0017
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/16/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296488/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664335/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 10/16/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {296488/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments {664335/1 Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM