Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Disease Control and Prevention - HPV Screening Tests
Sponsored by
Delegate Angel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a health care practitioner who offers a screening test to a man for a sexually transmitted infection to offer a screening test for HPV to the same man at the same time; requiring health care practitioners who offer the HPV screening test to inform the individual about the risks associated with HPV; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Disease Control and Prevention - HPV Screening Tests
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Disease Control and Prevention - HPV Screening Tests
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-214.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM