Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a clerk to account for and pay into the General Fund of the State the entire fee received for a trader's license issued in a county or municipal corporation that selects a uniform license fee; exempting from the fee a visually handicapped applicant who meets certain standards and Blind Industries and Services of Maryland; requiring a clerk to review the accuracy of a statement made by an applicant on the application for a trader's license regarding the applicant's place of business before issuing a license; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0331
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0459 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/05/2018
Legislative Date
9/05/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993793/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed 47-0
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/05/2018 9/05/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
House 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {993793/1 Adopted 27
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Referred Finance 30
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed 47-0 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Text - Chapter -
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-1804, 17-1806 through 17-1808, 17-1807.1, 17-1813, 17-206, 17-302 )
(   11-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM