Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Hearing Examiners - Change of Job Title
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Changing the job title of "hearing examiners" of the Public Service Commission to "public utility law judges".
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0011
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0173 Session: 2005 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
10/02/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 10/02/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/14/2015 1/14/2015 Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 20
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 20
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 22
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Finance 22
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-105, 2-108, 2-303, 2-306, 2-307, 2-308, 3-104, 3-108, 3-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM