Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rebuilding Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting a demolition or partial demolition of a school building under the Baltimore City Public Schools' 10-year Plan from specified notice requirements; altering the definition of "vacant dwelling" for purposes of property tax credits against the property tax imposed on specified vacant dwellings and newly constructed dwellings located in Baltimore City; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant a property tax credit against property tax imposed on property in specified neighborhoods in Baltimore City; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/25/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {905769/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {129736/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Delegates Walker, Platt, and Reilly
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senators Ferguson, Madaleno, and Eckardt
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Busch) Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 8/25/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {905769/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {129736/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Delegates Walker, Platt, and Reilly 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senators Ferguson, Madaleno, and Eckardt 65
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Busch) Adopted 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 72
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 68
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM