Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Local Law Enforcement Surveillance Programs and Equipment - Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local law enforcement agency to send written notification within 30 days to the local governing body of the county or municipal corporation in which the local law enforcement agency is located on the initiation of the operation of electronic surveillance equipment; requiring each local law enforcement agency that operates electronic surveillance equipment to submit a comprehensive report on the operation of the equipment on or before January 31 annually to specified local governing body or municipal corporation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/27/2016
Legislative Date
9/27/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/27/2016 9/27/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Local Law Enforcement Surveillance Programs and Equipment - Reporting
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM