Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Applicant Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a list of criteria, a finding of which requires the Secretary of State Police to issue a handgun permit to a person, to include a finding that the person has demonstrated competence with a handgun by presenting specified evidence; and repealing the requirement that the Secretary find that a person has a good and substantial reason to wear, carry, or transport a handgun before issuing a handgun permit to the person.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/25/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 10/25/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM