Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Total Real Property Tax
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, for purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the homeowners' property tax credit, the definition of "total real property tax" by increasing, under certain circumstances, the maximum assessment against which the homeowners' property tax credit may be granted; and applying the Act to tax credits for taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2017
Legislative Date
10/23/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/23/2017 10/23/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Total Real Property Tax
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page