Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Student Debt Relief Act of 2019
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Maryland Promise Plus Scholarship program to provide tuition assistance to certain students attending eligible State institutions; establishing eligibility requirements to include limitations on gross income levels under certain circumstances; providing for an annual scholarship award of no more than $10,000 per recipient; providing the scholarship be converted to a loan under certain circumstances; allowing a subtraction modification for a certain amount of interest paid on student loans; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0088
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Student Debt Relief Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations Ways and Means
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Student Debt Relief Act of 2019
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Reassigned to Appropriations Ways and Means 7
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3701 through 18-3707 )
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM