Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an employer is liable under specified circumstances in an action concerning a violation of specified provisions of employment discrimination and retaliation law based on quid pro quo harassment or the creation or continuation of harassment in a hostile work environment; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0527
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1350 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2015
Legislative Date
1/16/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2015 1/16/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM