Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transfer of Structured Settlements - Childhood Lead Poisoning Claims - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegate Haynes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an application for authorization of a transfer of specified structured settlement payment rights to be filed in a circuit court in the county where the payee resides; requiring the payee to appear in person at the hearing on an application for authorization of a transfer of specified structured settlement payment rights; prohibiting the payee from transferring more than 25% of the discounted present value of future payments under a specified structured settlement agreement; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/28/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 8/28/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1102, 5-1103, 5-1103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM