Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Duties of Guardian of the Person and Visitation Between Adult Child and Parent
Sponsored by
Delegate Saab
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the duties of a guardian of a disabled person to include enforcing the right to receive visitors and specified communications; authorizing an adult child to file a petition to compel visitation with a parent; requiring the court to appoint an independent investigator to conduct an investigation and report to the court; requiring the court to determine whether the proposed visitee has specified decision-making capacity; requiring the court to grant or deny visitation under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0070
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 8/06/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-708, 13-708.1 )
(   15-101 through 15-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM