Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Buckel, Cassilly, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, Cox, Ghrist, Grammer, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Commission as an independent unit of State government; providing for the intent of the General Assembly regarding legislative and congressional redistricting; requiring the members of the Redistricting Commission to be selected by March 1, 2021 and each year ending in the number one thereafter; requiring the Redistricting Commission to conduct a certain selection process, establish certain districts, and conduct its business in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0090
Bill File Type: Regular
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 8-7A-01 through 8-7A-12 )
(   5-202, 5-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM