Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale
Sponsored by
Delegate Ali
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a holder of a Class C beer and light wine license or a Class C beer, wine, and liquor license from certain hours-of-sale restrictions in the area of Baltimore City bounded by Liberty Heights Avenue, Northern Parkway, Druid Park Drive, and Wabash Avenue.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2017
Legislative Date
10/23/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/23/2017 10/23/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-2005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM