Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the assessed valuation of specified real property used in calculating the wealth of a jurisdiction for purposes of education aid to remain at a specified assessment for a specified period of time; defining specified terms; and applying the Act to the calculation of payments of State aid to counties and Baltimore City for fiscal years after June 30, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/23/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/23/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201, 12-203 )
(   16-305, 5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM