Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a redeemable ground rent to be redeemed when the property subject to the ground rent is transferred or the leasehold tenant obtains or refinances a loan on the property; requiring the transferee or borrower to request a redemption statement from the ground lease holder if the ground lease is registered with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; requiring the ground lease holder to send a redemption statement containing specified information within 60 days after receiving a request; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1529 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/14/2016
Legislative Date
7/14/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/14/2016 7/14/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM