Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones and A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering and clarifying the duties of the Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Special Order until 2/11 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2015 1/19/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 20
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Special Order until 2/11 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 20
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Second Reading Passed 21
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 23
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Finance 23
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-10A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM